FL H7019 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Chapter No. 2024-261; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 7017 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Chapter No. 2024-261; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 7017 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires value of homestead exemption be adjusted annually; requiring Legislature appropriate funds for specified purpose; require funds be distributed in specified manner; requires specified counties provide certain documentation.
Title
Exemption of Homesteads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#566 (Y: 84 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#566 (Y: 84 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Chapter No. 2024-261; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 7017 (Passed) | |
2024-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-06-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 26 NAYS 14 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (847706) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 9 NAYS 5 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 84, NAYS 31 |
2024-02-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2024) |
2024-01-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-01-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-01-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-23 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-23 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-19 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7017 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |