FL H7025 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7004
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7004
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to SBE, FCS, Academically Challenging Curriculum to Enhance Learning options, single-gender programs, charter technical career centers & public technical centers, virtual education options, school readiness program providers, VPK, & ELCs, Competency-Based Education Pilot Program, Art in Capitol Competition, DJJ education programs, automotive service technology education programs, Board of Trustees of St. Petersburg College, coordinated screening & progress monitoring system, & instructional materials adoption cycles.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7004 |
2024-02-29 | House | Substituted CS/SB 7004 |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-27 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2024-01-18 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-01-18 | House | Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-01-16 | House | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1444 (Same As) 2024-01-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1403 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-163; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)
S7004 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-160, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2024-101), CS/CS/HB 1403 (Ch. 2024-163), CS/HB 1425 (Ch. 2024-133)
H1425 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-133; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)
S1352 (Similar To) 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1425
S7048 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1403
H1285 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Chapter No. 2024-101; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7002 (Ch. 2024-159), CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)
S996 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1285
H1403 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-163; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)
S7004 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-160, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2024-101), CS/CS/HB 1403 (Ch. 2024-163), CS/HB 1425 (Ch. 2024-133)
H1425 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-133; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)
S1352 (Similar To) 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1425
S7048 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1403
H1285 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Chapter No. 2024-101; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7002 (Ch. 2024-159), CS/SB 7004 (Ch. 2024-160)
S996 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1285
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 3105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 49965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 841 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |