FL H7043 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6 (Ch. 2019-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6 (Ch. 2019-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and amends provisions that have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration & may be omitted from 2019 Florida Statutes only through reviser's bill duly enacted by Legislature.
Title
Florida Statutes/Non-current Repeals or Expiration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 6 (Ch. 2019-4) |
2019-03-20 | House | Substituted SB 6 |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S6 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Chapter No. 2019-4
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0898 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 24075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
932 | 7055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 6865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7043 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7043/BillText/Filed/PDF |