FL H7047 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & creates emergency management provisions relating to transfer & expenditure of moneys in Emergency Preparedness & Response Fund; state comprehensive emergency management plan; statewide awareness & education programs; personal protection equipment; contracts with providers for care of persons with disabilities or limitations; duration of emergency orders & rules issued by Governor; agency disaster preparedness plans; agency & political subdivision spending plans; emergency orders; emergency mitigation studies; DOH public health emergency plan; collection & reporting & publication of information by State Health Officer; & functions of district medical examiners.
Title
Emergency Management
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee | Rep. Tom Leek [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8) |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-20 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | PCS added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-31 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2021-03-26 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H945 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
H1353 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S1760 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S1924 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S2006 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Chapter No. 2021-8
H1353 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S1760 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S1924 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S2006 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Chapter No. 2021-8
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 359 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 3611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |