FL H7057 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to Florida Industrial Development Corporation.
Title
Florida Industrial Development Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House Roll Call No. 0563 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-03-16 | In Messages | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00249; Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 1 -HJ 00249 | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00232 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Calendar -HJ 00151 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0289 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0440 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0658 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |