FL H7065 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DCF to adopt rules & procedures for exempting household members with disabilities from being fingerprinted before child is placed in home; authorizes court to make certain determinations regarding placement of child with guardian; authorizes department to recover financial assistance provided to nonrelative caregivers under certain circumstances; terminates Relative Caregiver Program on specified date & transfers certain responsibilities to Guardianship Assistance Program; requires department to establish & operate Guardianship Assistance Program to provide guardianship assistance payments to certain guardians beginning on specified date & provides eligibility requirements.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#755 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-16 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-15 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/15/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-06 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1514 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S590 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1435
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
H5003 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-10
S590 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1435
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
H5003 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-10
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 5085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1676 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |