FL H7069 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to private activity bonds, including definitions, state volume limitation, allocation & reallocation, issuance, reports, notices of intent, confirmation of allocation, final certificate of allocation, distribution, allocation pools, mortgage credit certificates, carryforward, infrastructure projects, & applications.
Title
Private Activity Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7054 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Chapter No. 2024-220
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
159 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 80751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 8105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 812 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 2520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |