FL H7079 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to DOE powers & duties, Florida Partnership for Minority and Underrepresented Student Achievement, statewide assessment program, turnaround options & plans, school grading system, & turnaround school supplemental services allocation.
Title
Education
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | House PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee | Rep. Vance Aloupis [R] |
Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#624 (Y: 105 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 105 NAYS 11 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (141393, 177341, 456069, 480151, 863257, 903163, 957307) 905 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-24 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 3 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-10 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S1818 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H641 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
S1818 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H641 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 3415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |