FL H7109 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits terms of office of PSC commissioners appointed after certain date; requires specified PSC meetings & workshops to be recorded or streamed live; requires specified persons to register as lobbyist if communicating with PSC Nominating Council; revises provisions regarding ex parte communications; requires PSC commissioners to take ethics training; specifies amount of money that may be charged by public utilities for deposits; revises provisions regarding notification of specified customer rates; specifies uses of certain funds received for demand-side renewable energy systems; authorizes the PSC to issue orders to grant issuance of nuclear asset-recovery bonds; creates provisions regarding financing of such bonds.
Title
Florida Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#247 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#177 (Y: 30 N: 78 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#176 (Y: 40 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#175 (Y: 40 N: 75 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#174 (Y: 42 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#173 (Y: 42 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#172 (Y: 42 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#171 (Y: 42 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#170 (Y: 41 N: 74 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#169 (Y: 37 N: 77 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#247 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#177 (Y: 30 N: 78 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#176 (Y: 40 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#175 (Y: 40 N: 75 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#174 (Y: 42 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#173 (Y: 42 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#172 (Y: 42 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#171 (Y: 42 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#170 (Y: 41 N: 74 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#169 (Y: 37 N: 77 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Chapter No. 2015-129 | |
2015-06-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Receded from 3 amendment(s) (251712, 606844, 927036) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | In returning messages |
2015-04-28 | House | Requested Senate to recede |
2015-04-28 | House | Refused to concur in 3 amendment(s) (251712, 606844, 927036) |
2015-04-28 | House | Was taken up |
2015-04-24 | House | In returning messages |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (251712, 606844, 620188) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 288 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Amendment(s) failed (039445, 052613, 082091, 141911, 297903, 403367, 529481, 579271) |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-09 | House | CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-31 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0219 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
S0288 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
H0081 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
S0230 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
H0199 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
S0170 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
S0288 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
H0081 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
S0230 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
H0199 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
S0170 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2015-129)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
350 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
350 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |