FL H7125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes additional monetary penalty on dealer for willfully failing to collect specified taxes or fees after notice of duty to collect taxes or fees by DOR; specifies schedule of criminal penalties relating to amounts not collected; requires DOR to send written notice of duty to register by specified means; revises provisions imposing additional monetary penalty on persons making false or fraudulent returns, etc.
Title
Criminal Penalties for Violations of Tax Statutes
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Fresen [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0953 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01055; Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 2 -HJ 01055 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00939 | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00676; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00676 | |
2010-04-08 | On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/12/10, 1:00 pm, 404-H | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00301 | |
2010-03-15 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00276 |
Same As/Similar To
S1978 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |