FL H7169 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires assessments of state-owned real property upon request; requires annual written notification from local governments to property appraisers; authorizes DOR to provide specified information to DEP; revises requirements for DMS to develop inventories of state-owned or state-occupied facilities; requires DEP to maintain comprehensive database of state-owned lands; specifies duties of DMS, etc.
Title
State-owned Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died on Calendar | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00407; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00407 | |
2010-03-23 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/25/10, 11:15 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00358 | |
2010-03-19 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00347 |
Same As/Similar To
S1516 (Similar To) 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00004; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)
S1238 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H1509 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1752; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -HJ 01135
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)
S1238 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H1509 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1752; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -HJ 01135
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0193 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0193 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0216 | 0152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0253 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0253 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |