FL H9001 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 312 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 312 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 2016 as "Bladder Cancer Awareness Month" in Florida.
Title
Bladder Cancer Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 312 (Adopted) |
2016-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0312 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9001 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/9001 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/9001/BillText/Filed/PDF |