FL H9015 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates FSU Soccer Team for winning 2014 NCAA Women's Soccer Championship.
Title
Florida State University Soccer Team
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Williams [D] | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] | Rep. Amanda Murphy [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R] |
Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-16 | House | Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died, not introduced, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9015 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/9015 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/9015/BillText/Filed/PDF |