FL S0014 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Maury Hernandez; providing an appropriation to compensate Maury Hernandez, a former Broward County Sheriff's deputy, for injuries and damages sustained as a consequence of the Department of Corrections' failures to enforce probation laws, regulations, and policies; providing legislative intent that certain liens be waived; providing a limitation on the payment of compensation and attorney fees, etc.
Title
Relief of Maury Hernandez/Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6005 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/14 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/14/BillText/Filed/HTML |