FL S0068 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Compensates Eric Brody for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of the Broward County Sheriff's Office. Authorizes the Sheriff of Broward County to execute an assignment to the legal guardians of Eric Brody of all claims that the Broward County Sheriff's Office has against its insurer arising out of its handling of the claim against the sheriff's office. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM: $30,760,372.
Title
Relief/Eric Brody/Broward County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal Justice | |
2010-04-16 | References corrected to The Special Master on Claim Bills; Criminal Justice -SJ 00636; Recommendation: Unfavorable by The Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 00636; Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00636; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/19/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 00017 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to The Special Master on Claim Bills | |
2009-07-31 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1597 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)