FL S0078 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Chapter No. 2024-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Chapter No. 2024-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision to conform to the directive of the Legislature in section 9 of chapter 2012-116, Laws of Florida, codified as section 11.242(5)(j), Florida Statutes, to prepare a reviser's bill to omit all statutes and laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#540 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Chapter No. 2024-4 | |
2024-02-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-02-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-01-18 | House | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-17 | House | Substituted for HB 7033 |
2024-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-11 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/17/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-01-10 | House | In Messages |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/10/24 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2023-12-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 12/13/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7033 (Same As) 2024-01-17 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 78