FL S0096 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Including notice of the approval of an application for Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals status issued by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services as valid proof of identity for purposes of applying for a driver license; reenacting provisions relating to conditions and limitations with respect to obtaining a duplicate or replacement instruction permit or driver license, expiration of and renewal of a driver license, and change of name or address on a driver license for licensees who establish their identity in a specified manner, to incorporate the amendment made by the act to s. 322.08, F.S., in references thereto, etc.
Title
Requirements for Driver Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0045 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/96 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0096/BillText/Filed/HTML |