FL S0098 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Florida Firearms Freedom Act. Provides that specified firearms, firearm accessories, and ammunition for personal use manufactured in the state are not subject to federal law or regulation. Provides that certain basic materials are not subject to federal regulation of firearms, firearm accessories, or ammunition under interstate commerce, etc.
Title
Regulation of Firearms [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/19/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S --Not considered | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, 110-S --Not considered | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 -SJ 00349; Now in Judiciary -SJ 00349 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules -SJ 00018 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0021 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)