FL S0112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from filing or causing to be filed, with intent to defraud or harass another, a document relating to the ownership, transfer, or encumbrance of, or claim against, real or personal property, or any interest in real or personal property; establishing reclassified penalties for persons who commit the specified offenses a second or subsequent time when the person is a convicted offender who commits the specified offenses while incarcerated in a jail or participating in a community correctional program and when the victim of the offense is a public officer or employee or incurs financial losses under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Filing False Documents Against Real or Personal Property
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Charles Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#342 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-228 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 915 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/13, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/06/13, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0915 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 112 (Ch. 2013-228)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
817 | 535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 0855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |