FL S0166 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the operation of a neighborhood vehicle on certain roads with certain restrictions; providing that a neighborhood vehicle is subject to the same license tax as an electric vehicle or a low-speed vehicle; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to issue a license plate for a neighborhood vehicle upon payment of certain fees and taxes; requiring the department to issue a decal to the owner or lessee of a registered low-speed vehicle or neighborhood vehicle; requiring that the decal be clearly displayed, etc.
Title
Neighborhood Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-09-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 10/09/13, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
261 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0847 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/166 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0166/BillText/Filed/HTML |