FL S0186 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from requesting or requiring access to a social media account of an employee or prospective employee; prohibiting an employer from taking retaliatory personnel action against an employee as a result of the employee's refusal to allow access to his or her social media account; prohibiting an employer from failing or refusing to hire a prospective employee as a result of the prospective employee's refusal to allow access to his or her social media account, etc.
Title
Social Media Privacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-10-05 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 10/05/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0635 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee