FL S0190 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from falsely personating a firefighter; defining the term "watchman"; prohibiting operation or ownership of a motor vehicle falsely marked with the intent to mislead or cause another person to believe that such vehicle is authorized by a fire department for use by the person operating it; providing an exception, etc.
Title
False Personation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/24/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/17/14, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1215 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
843 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |