FL S0190 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 81
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 81
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health to create and make available electronically a pamphlet with specified information; requiring hospitals that provide birthing services to provide the informational pamphlet to parents during postpartum education; requiring certain health care practitioners to ensure that the pamphlet is provided to parents after a planned out-of-hospital birth; revising applicable provisions for the reimbursement of school-based services by the Agency for Health Care Administration to certain school districts, etc.
Title
Health Care for Children
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Bill Montford [D] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Sen. Oscar Braynon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 81 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 81 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred to Education; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H81 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-79
S1650 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S46 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1650 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S46 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |