FL S0190 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 95
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 95
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the elements that constitute the capital offense of murder in the first degree; revising the elements that constitute the felony offense of murder in the third degree; prohibiting specified activities involving controlled substances within 1,000 feet of additional specified facilities; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 95 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 95 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 6 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2022-01-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H95 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-129
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |