FL S0194 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding grounds for the reclassification of crimes to include prejudice based on the gender or gender identity of any person; specifying that the reclassification occurs if the crime was based in whole or in part on the race, color, ancestry, ethnicity, religion, sexual orientation, national origin, homeless status, advanced age, gender, or gender identity of any person; specifying that the reclassification of a certain crime occurs if the crime was based in whole or in part on a disability of any person; expanding the data the Governor is required to collect and disseminate to include incidents of criminal acts that evidence prejudice based on gender, gender identity, or disability, etc.
Title
Crimes Evidencing Prejudice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H43 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0863 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
877 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |