FL S0204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that a custodial interrogation at a place of detention be electronically recorded in its entirety in connection with certain offenses; requiring law enforcement officers who do not comply with the electronic recording requirement or who conduct custodial interrogations at a place other than a place of detention to prepare a specified report; prohibiting introduction into or possession of any cellular telephone or other portable communication device on the grounds of any county detention facility, etc.
Title
Detention Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1029 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
900 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |