FL S0228 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Elections of the Department of State to develop an online voter registration system; requiring the division to conduct a comprehensive risk assessment of the online voter registration system; requiring the system to compare information submitted online with Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles records; requiring the division to report to the Legislature regarding online voter registration implementation by a specified date, etc.
Title
Online Voter Application
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Ethics and Elections Committee | Sen. Jeff Clemens [D] | Sen. Garrett Richter [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#372 (Y: 109 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#372 (Y: 109 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Chapter No. 2015-36 | |
2015-05-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2015-04-29 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 3 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (290701) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | In returning messages |
2015-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 9 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (290701) |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Substituted for HB 7143 |
2015-04-27 | House | Received |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 3 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/17/15, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0227 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)
H1161 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 184 (Ch. 2015-40), CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)
S7064 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)
H7143 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)
H1161 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 184 (Ch. 2015-40), CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)
S7064 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)
H7143 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 228 (Ch. 2015-36)