FL S0232 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7039 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7039 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
(THIS BILL COMBINES S232, S848, & S870) Providing honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in specified counties, etc.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Jim Norman [R] | Sen. Steve Oelrich [R] |
Senate Transportation Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7039 (Ch. | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-13 | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 501 | |
2012-02-13 | CS/CS by- Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-08 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 329 | |
2012-02-06 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-02 | Remaining combined CS references: Community Affairs | |
2012-02-02 | CS combines this bill with SB 848, SB 870 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/02/12, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 25 | |
2011-09-21 | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs -SJ 25 | |
2011-09-14 | Filed |