FL S0240 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting engaging in protest activities within a specified distance of the property line of the location of a funeral, burial, or memorial service; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Protest Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0015 (Similar To) 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-19
H0185 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19)
S0118 (Similar To) 2013-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19)
H0185 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19)
S0118 (Similar To) 2013-03-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 15 (Ch. 2013-19)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/240 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0240/BillText/Filed/HTML |