FL S0248 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides conditions for reclassification as a resident for tuition purposes. Requires that evidence be provided relating to dependent status. Provides additional categories within which students may be classified as residents for tuition purposes. Limits eligibility for state financial aid, etc.
Title
Tuition/Resident Status Determination [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Higher Education | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education; Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00027 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Higher Education; Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Higher Education Appropriations | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |