FL S0334 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain boards and entities within the Divisions of Certified Public Accounting, Professions, or Real Estate of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to use a specified process for the review of an applicant's criminal record to determine the applicant's eligibility for certain licenses; prohibiting the conviction of a crime before a specified date from being grounds for the denial of certain licenses, etc.
Title
Professional Regulation
Sponsors
Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/08/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H397 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |