FL S0334 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as "Jaime's Law"; requiring background checks for the sale or transfer of ammunition; providing exceptions, etc.
Title
Sale or Transfer of Ammunition
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H181 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H183 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S346 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H183 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S346 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/334 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/334/BillText/Filed/HTML |