FL S0344 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for district school board policies that authorize commercial advertisements on school buses; providing policy requirements relating to reimbursement to the school district, prohibited advertisements, and signage and equipment standards; requiring a school bus to be withdrawn from use under certain circumstances; providing for the remittance and allocation of revenue, etc.
Title
Public School Buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2012-01-23 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2012-01-23 | Now in Budget -SJ 263 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 -SJ 263 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-11 | Now in Transportation -SJ 112 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time -SJ 101 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 33 | |
2012-01-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-09 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/09/12, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-10-18 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Transportation; Budget -SJ 33 | |
2011-09-26 | Filed |