FL S0346 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing proceeds from a discretionary sales surtax to fund capital restoration of natural water bodies for public use under certain circumstances; limiting uses to dredging operations related to ecologically beneficial muck removal, etc.
Title
Local Government Infrastructure Surtax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/25/16, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/01/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0995 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1013 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0597 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |