FL S0348 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the types of emergency transportation vehicle services provided to Medicare-eligible persons for which Medicaid shall pay deductibles and coinsurance; specifying that such payments must be made according to certain procedure codes, etc.
Title
Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#115 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Chapter No. 2021-95 | |
2021-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-14 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 461 |
2021-04-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | In Messages |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time 267 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/21 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/11/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/03/21, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H461 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 348 (Ch. 2021-95)