FL S0348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the program within the Department of Financial Services for a certain purpose; providing eligibility requirements to receive a rebate under the program; authorizing eligible persons to apply to the program if certain documentation and proof are provided; specifying the calculation of the rebate and procedures for disbursing funds, etc.
Title
Insurance Rebate Program for Low-Income Seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1055 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/348 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/348/BillText/Filed/HTML |