FL S0350 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Decker-Backmann Act"; requiring the heads of law enforcement agencies or their designees to review certain cold cases upon receiving a written application from a designated person; providing requirements for such reviews; requiring law enforcement agencies to provide specified training; requiring law enforcement agencies, by a specified date and periodically thereafter, to report certain data to the Global Forensic and Justice Center at Florida International University, etc.
Title
Cold Case Murders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H837 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee