FL S0396 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to annually proclaim a specified day as "Holocaust Remembrance Day"; authorizing "Holocaust Remembrance Day" to be observed in this state's public schools and be observed by public exercise as the Governor may designate, etc.
Title
Holocaust Remembrance Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Messages |
2024-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-28 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H387 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Quality Subcommittee