FL S0416 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing lists of raw agricultural commodities at high risk or potentially at risk for cultivation in a genetically engineered form; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to publish the lists by a specified date and to update a published list annually; providing for enforcement of the labeling requirements, etc.
Title
Labeling of Genetically Engineered Foods
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0351 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/416 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0416/BillText/Filed/HTML |