FL S0416 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the required credits for certain students for a standard high school diploma to include one-half credit of instruction in civics and seven and one-half, rather than eight, credits in electives; requiring certain students to correctly answer a minimum number of questions on a test identical to the civics portion of the naturalization test used by the United States Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services, etc.
Title
High School Graduation Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H73 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S114 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S114 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/416 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/416/BillText/Filed/HTML |