FL S0426 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOC to provide each inmate in a correctional facility the opportunity to place a security freeze on his or her consumer report. Requires the department, at the request of the inmate, to provide the appropriate forms to the inmate to initiate the security freeze process. Requires that the inmate pay all fees and expenses incurred in the application for a security freeze.
Title
Consumer Protection/Consumer Reports/Inmates [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00038 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Commerce; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2009-10-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0775 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)