FL S0428 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the owner or operator of a child care facility to report background screening results to the DCFS before employing a person at the child care facility. Prohibits the hiring of a person with a disqualifying offense without being granted an exemption. Prohibits the Agency for Health Care Administration from granting an exemption from disqualification from employment in an assisted living facility under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Human Services Personnel [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Aronberg [D] | Sen. Nan Rich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | |
2010-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/09/10, 3:30 pm, 401-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00038 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2009-10-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0201 (Similar To) 2009-11-18 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0724 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S0724 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0402 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 30501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 3055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 3057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 3131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 1757 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0411 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0429 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |