FL S0442 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a county to provide certain services and facilities outside the boundaries of a municipality without the express consent of the municipality's governing body under certain circumstances; prohibiting a municipality from extending its corporate powers within unincorporated areas of a county without the express consent of the county's governing body, etc.
Title
Local Government Services
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0337 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
180 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/442 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0442/BillText/Filed/HTML |