FL S0486 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to protect the rights of all persons to acquire and possess real property, etc.
Title
Right to Acquire and Possess Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0367 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S1584 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S1584 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/486 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0486/BillText/Filed/HTML |