FL S0492 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision that provides that certain information relating to a state death tax credit or a generation-skipping transfer credit is not applicable to estates of decedents dying after a specific date; providing an exception to property held by agents and fiduciaries; providing that property held by fiduciaries under trust instruments is presumed unclaimed under certain circumstances; specifying that a certain subsection does not require a caveator to be served with formal notice of its own petition for administration; providing provisions relating to gifts to lawyers and other disqualified persons, etc.
Title
Estates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#404 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-172 | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 583 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Received |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/13 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0583 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 492 (Ch. 2013-172)
H7105 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 999 (Ch. 2013-92), CS/CS/SB 492 (Ch. 2013-172)
S1828 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 999 (Ch. 2013-92), CS/CS/SB 492 (Ch. 2013-172)
H7105 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 999 (Ch. 2013-92), CS/CS/SB 492 (Ch. 2013-172)
S1828 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 999 (Ch. 2013-92), CS/CS/SB 492 (Ch. 2013-172)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
198 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
731 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
731 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
733 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 02025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 08125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0813 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
738 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |