FL S0492 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain health insurance policies and health maintenance contracts from requiring insureds and subscribers to obtain certain prescription drugs exclusively from mail order pharmacies for the treatment of specified chronic illnesses; requiring certain health maintenance organizations to include specified disclosures in their outlines of coverage regarding such prescription drugs, etc.
Title
Provision of Pharmaceutical Services
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H289 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 6442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/492 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/492/BillText/Filed/HTML |