FL S0520 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to guardians of incapacitated world war veterans, etc.
Title
Veteran's Guardianship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1125 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 958 | |
2012-03-07 | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 1160 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1160 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1117 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -HJ 1100 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1100 | |
2012-02-10 | In Messages | |
2012-02-08 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 346 | |
2012-02-08 | Read 3rd time -SJ 346 | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 322 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 46 | |
2011-12-05 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 111 | |
2011-12-05 | Favorable by- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-28 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 12/05/11, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-17 | Now in Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-17 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 111 | |
2011-11-04 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/17/11, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-02 | Now in Judiciary | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security | |
2011-10-12 | Filed |