FL S0520 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing additional forms for the mandatory offer of nonforfeiture benefits in long-term care insurance policies, etc.
Title
Long-term Care Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#299 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Chapter No. 2015-21 | |
2015-05-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | House | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Substituted for HB 221 |
2015-04-22 | House | Received |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0221 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 520 (Ch. 2015-21)