FL S0520 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Re-creating the State-Operated Institutions Inmate Welfare Trust Fund within the Department of Corrections; abrogating provisions relating to the termination of the trust fund, etc.
Title
State-Operated Institutions Inmate Welfare Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 83 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Substituted HB 83 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/24 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2024-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2023-11-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H83 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-26
H5001 (Similar To) 2024-06-14 - Chapter No. 2024-231; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 83 (Ch. 2024-26), CS/HB 151 (Ch. 2024-92), HB 5003 (Ch. 2024-228), HB 5005 (Ch. 2024-229), HB 5101 (Ch. 2024-230), HB 5201 (Ch. 2024-37), HB 5203 (Ch. 2024-55), HB 5401 (Ch. 2024-194), SB 2518 (Ch. 2024-227)
S2500 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
H5001 (Similar To) 2024-06-14 - Chapter No. 2024-231; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 83 (Ch. 2024-26), CS/HB 151 (Ch. 2024-92), HB 5003 (Ch. 2024-228), HB 5005 (Ch. 2024-229), HB 5101 (Ch. 2024-230), HB 5201 (Ch. 2024-37), HB 5203 (Ch. 2024-55), HB 5401 (Ch. 2024-194), SB 2518 (Ch. 2024-227)
S2500 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001