FL S0526 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising student eligibility requirements for receipt of a Florida Medallion Scholars award with respect to national examination scores, etc.
Title
Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0387 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/526 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0526/BillText/Filed/HTML |